NY A01350 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the petitioner for appointment as the guardian for an incapacitated person to identify all other persons who may be able to manage the affairs of such incapacitated person; prohibits appointment solely for the purposes of bill collection or resolving a bill collection dispute.
Title
Requires the petitioner for appointment as the guardian for an incapacitated person to identify all other persons who may be able to manage the affairs of such incapacitated person; prohibits appointment solely for the purposes of bill collection or resolving a bill collection dispute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-07-31 | Assembly | print number 1350a |
2017-07-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04083 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES