NY A01346 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - advanced to third reading cal.640
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - advanced to third reading cal.640
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to segregated confinement.
Title
Relates to segregated confinement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.640 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | print number 1346b |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | committed to correction |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.67 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.180 |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | reported |
2015-02-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-20 | Assembly | print number 1346a |
2015-01-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S05900 (Same As) 2016-06-03 - PRINT NUMBER 5900A