NY A01332 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-21 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits making alterations to student athletic records.
Title
Prohibits making alterations to student athletic records.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Walter Mosley [D] | Asm. Andrew Raia [R] | Asm. Peter Lawrence [R] |
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01966 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - referred to education