NY A01308 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notification requirements for traffic-control signal photo violation-monitoring devices and photo speed violation monitoring systems.
Title
Relates to notification requirements for traffic-control signal photo violation-monitoring devices and photo speed violation monitoring systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | print number 1308a |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06719 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION