NY A01307 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires food allergy awareness in food establishments and online food ordering services; penalty not to exceed $125.
Title
Requires food allergy awareness in food establishments and online food ordering services; penalty not to exceed $125.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.94 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | substituted for a1307a |
2019-06-04 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1164 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.66 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | substituted by s5726 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.94 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.94 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | print number 1307a |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |