NY A01300 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to making the provisions governing liquor licenses consistent with respect to public interest factors.
Title
Relates to making the provisions governing liquor licenses consistent with respect to public interest factors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.118 |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00151 (Same As) 2017-01-04 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
S07079 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
S07079 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS