NY A01300 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - advanced to third reading cal.542
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - advanced to third reading cal.542
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a person from operating a truck while anyone under the age of eighteen is in the cargo area of such truck; provides certain exceptions for farm type tractors, trucks used for agricultural purposes and trucks used in parades.
Title
Prohibits a person from operating a truck while anyone under the age of eighteen is in the cargo area of such truck; provides certain exceptions for farm type tractors, trucks used for agricultural purposes and trucks used in parades.
Sponsors
Asm. David Gantt [D] | Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. William Magnarelli [D] | Asm. Audrey Pheffer [D] |
Asm. Philip Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.542 |
2012-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2012-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-03-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.72 |
2011-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2011-02-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |