NY A01297 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the supervision of certain limited profit housing companies.
Title
Relates to the supervision of certain limited profit housing companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.64 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.475 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to housing |