NY A01278 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires non-preferential opportunity for use of amenities in certain buildings and apartments.
Title
Requires non-preferential opportunity for use of amenities in certain buildings and apartments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | referred to housing |