NY A01267 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - amended on third reading 1267c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires applications to purchase condominiums or cooperatives to be acted upon.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires applications to purchase condominiums or cooperatives to be acted upon.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14Assemblyamended on third reading 1267c
2019-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.237
2019-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.237
2019-06-13Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 1267b
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-31Assemblyprint number 1267a
2019-05-31Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to housing
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S06408 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - PRINT NUMBER 6408A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01267&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01267&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01267
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01267&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01267A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01267&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01267B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01267&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01267C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01267&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01267&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback