NY A01255 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - signed chap.34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - signed chap.34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to placement of former foster care youth during a certain state of emergency.
Title
Relates to placement of former foster care youth during a certain state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Assembly | signed chap.34 |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-02-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.138 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2075 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.23 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S02075 (Same As) 2021-02-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1255