NY A01251 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - signed chap.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - signed chap.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an injured worker or person entitled to a death benefit to be provided with the option to have the compensation payment made through direct deposit, and requires such person be given notice of such option and the means necessary to enroll.
Title
Requires an injured worker or person entitled to a death benefit to be provided with the option to have the compensation payment made through direct deposit, and requires such person be given notice of such option and the means necessary to enroll.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-28 | Assembly | signed chap.9 |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-01-26 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-01-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-01-26 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.69 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1298 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-01-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.21 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S01298 (Same As) 2021-01-26 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1251