NY A01251 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to siting requirements for the New York city school construction authority's leasing program.
Title
Relates to siting requirements for the New York city school construction authority's leasing program.
Sponsors
Asm. Catherine Nolan [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] |
Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-04-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.470 |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.98 |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03962 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS