NY A01235 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - print number 1235a
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-22 - print number 1235a
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a revolving loan fund through the New York state energy research and development authority for the purpose of building renewable energy storage systems scaled to function as microgrids to power housing owned by the New York city housing authority.
Title
Creates a revolving loan fund through the New York state energy research and development authority for the purpose of building renewable energy storage systems scaled to function as microgrids to power housing owned by the New York city housing authority.
Sponsors
Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D] | Asm. Juan Ardila [D] |
Asm. Karines Reyes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Assembly | print number 1235a |
2024-02-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to energy |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2023-01-13 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S00402 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE