NY A01226 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-22 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to violations of the uniform fire prevention and building code.
Title
Relates to violations of the uniform fire prevention and building code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.83 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.373 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06178 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT