NY A01223 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-7)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.329
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.329
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates standards by which the public service commission reviews and approves a merger or acquisition between telephone corporations, cable corporations and combination telephone and cable corporations.
Title
Creates standards by which the public service commission reviews and approves a merger or acquisition between telephone corporations, cable corporations and combination telephone and cable corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.329 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.329 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-03-23 | Assembly | print number 1223d |
2016-03-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-02-03 | Assembly | print number 1223c |
2016-02-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.638 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.638 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | print number 1223b |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | print number 1223a |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04888 (Same As) 2016-03-28 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN