NY A01204 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to HIV post-exposure prophylaxis and other health care services for sexual assault victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to HIV post-exposure prophylaxis and other health care services for sexual assault victims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1536
2019-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2279A
2019-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-17Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.236
2019-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.236
2019-06-13Assemblyreported
2019-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-10Assemblyprint number 1204a
2019-06-10Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-02-11Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-29Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S02279 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1204A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01204&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01204&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01204
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01204&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01204A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01204&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01204&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01204&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01204&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC4
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01204&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1204#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback