NY A01204 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.81
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits non-disclosure clauses in leases of real property to be used for hydraulic fracturing.
Title
Prohibits non-disclosure clauses in leases of real property to be used for hydraulic fracturing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.81 |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.372 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |