NY A01192 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - advanced to third reading cal.382
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits participation in torture and improper treatment of prisoners by health care professionals; prohibits a health care professional from engaging, assisting, planning the torture or improper treatment of a prisoner; requires health care professionals to report torture and improper treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits participation in torture and improper treatment of prisoners by health care professionals; prohibits a health care professional from engaging, assisting, planning the torture or improper treatment of a prisoner; requires health care professionals to report torture and improper treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.382
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-07Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S00596 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback