NY A01185 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - signed chap.404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - signed chap.404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the formula for determining the interest payable on a delayed legacy.
Title
Establishes the formula for determining the interest payable on a delayed legacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-21 | Senate | signed chap.404 |
2014-10-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-03-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.81 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4952 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.72 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.135 |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04952 (Same As) 2014-03-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1185