NY A01180 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-27 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to limited-profit housing companies and tax exemptions.
Title
Relates to limited-profit housing companies and tax exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-27 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05874 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT