NY A01177 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the marketing and expanding export trade - New York act to provide assistance to export trade development projects designed to encourage and assist businesses, industrial firms or industry groups to engage in export trade regionally and globally, and to coordinate other state economic development programs with such projects.
Title
Enacts the marketing and expanding export trade - New York act to provide assistance to export trade development projects designed to encourage and assist businesses, industrial firms or industry groups to engage in export trade regionally and globally, and to coordinate other state economic development programs with such projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-16 | Assembly | vetoed memo.108 |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.841 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5238 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.68 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.241 |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S05238 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1177