NY A01171 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - approval memo.99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Passed on December 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-30 - approval memo.99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires blanket health insurance policies to provide coverage for outpatient treatment by mental health practitioners (mental health counsellors, marriage and family therapists, creative arts therapists and psychoanalysts) licensed pursuant to article 163 of the education law.
Title
Requires blanket health insurance policies to provide coverage for outpatient treatment by mental health practitioners (mental health counsellors, marriage and family therapists, creative arts therapists and psychoanalysts) licensed pursuant to article 163 of the education law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | Assembly | approval memo.99 |
2022-12-30 | Assembly | signed chap.818 |
2022-12-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1506 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6574A |
2022-03-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.67 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.529 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.529 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 1171a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06574 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1171A