NY A01153 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the office of the independent intellectual and developmental disability ombudsman program for the purpose of assisting individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities to ensure that they receive coverage from managed care organizations that is appropriate in meeting their individual service needs and uses a request for proposal process to determine who shall be responsible for such program.
Title
Establishes the office of the independent intellectual and developmental disability ombudsman program for the purpose of assisting individuals with intellectual or developmental disabilities to ensure that they receive coverage from managed care organizations that is appropriate in meeting their individual service needs and uses a request for proposal process to determine who shall be responsible for such program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Assembly | tabled |
2021-10-25 | Assembly | vetoed memo.47 |
2021-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.719 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1766A |
2021-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.76 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.76 |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | print number 1153a |
2021-02-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S01766 (Same As) 2021-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1153A