NY A01153 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - advanced to third reading cal.635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - advanced to third reading cal.635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes, under certain circumstances, full-time college and university students to act as election inspectors and poll clerks in the election district where their college or university is located.
Title
Authorizes, under certain circumstances, full-time college and university students to act as election inspectors and poll clerks in the election district where their college or university is located.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.635 |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S01658 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS