NY A01151 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - delivered to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - delivered to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of health to make grants to not-for-profit organizations and elementary, secondary and postsecondary schools to be used to help pay for the costs of conducting local blood drives.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of health to make grants to not-for-profit organizations and elementary, secondary and postsecondary schools to be used to help pay for the costs of conducting local blood drives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.56 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.93 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.93 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03739 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH