NY A01150 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on November 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-04 - signed chap.399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Senior Center Council to provide a forum for the discussion of challenges facing senior centers.
Title
Establishes the Senior Center Council to provide a forum for the discussion of challenges facing senior centers.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Guillermo Linares [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-04 | Senate | signed chap.399 |
2016-10-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1805 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8099 |
2016-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.570 |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | committed to aging |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.51 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-04-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.175 |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S08099 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1150