NY A01148 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires every general hospital to have a community advisory board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires every general hospital to have a community advisory board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2019-03-28Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-28Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.23
2019-01-29Assemblyreported
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01856 (Same As) 2019-01-16 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback