NY A01147 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the department of health to create an informational pamphlet regarding the laparoscopic power morcellation surgery technique.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the department of health to create an informational pamphlet regarding the laparoscopic power morcellation surgery technique.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-10Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to health
2023-02-06Assemblyprint number 1147a
2023-02-06Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2023-01-13Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S02463 (Same As) 2024-05-14 - referred to health

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback