NY A01133 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - print number 1133c
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends procedures for making anatomical gifts; specifies persons authorized to make an anatomical gift under certain circumstances; provides procedures for amending and revoking gifts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends procedures for making anatomical gifts; specifies persons authorized to make an anatomical gift under certain circumstances; provides procedures for amending and revoking gifts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17Assemblyprint number 1133c
2019-05-17Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2019-05-15Assemblyprint number 1133b
2019-05-15Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2019-02-26Assemblyprint number 1133a
2019-02-26Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01342 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - PRINT NUMBER 1342A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback