NY A01130 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - signed chap.484
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

To allow dentists licensed in another state to participate in continuing education opportunities offered by accredited New York medical centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act to amend the education law, in relation to certain licensed dentists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-17 signed chap.484
2010-09-07 delivered to governor
2010-06-22 RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-22 PASSED SENATE
2010-04-21 3RD READING CAL.392
2010-04-21 SUBSTITUTED FOR S1928
2010-02-01 REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2010-02-01 delivered to senate
2010-02-01 passed assembly
2010-01-06 ordered to third reading cal.102
2010-01-06 RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-01-06 DIED IN SENATE
2009-03-12 REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2009-03-12 delivered to senate
2009-03-12 passed assembly
2009-03-05 advanced to third reading cal.179
2009-03-03 reported
2009-02-06 print number 1130a
2009-02-06 amend and recommit to higher education
2009-01-07 referred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S1928 (Same As) 2010-04-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1130A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback