NY A01121 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s7211b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s7211b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates certain offenses and provisions related to the unlawful dissemination of a personal image; creates a private right of action for such offenses.
Title
Creates certain offenses and provisions related to the unlawful dissemination of a personal image; creates a private right of action for such offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted by s7211b |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1121c |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2022-05-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2022-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-01-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1121b |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.62 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.527 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.527 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | print number 1121a |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06056 (Same As) 2021-05-27 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07211 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.88
S07211 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.88