NY A01105 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-9)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - substituted by s946a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - substituted by s946a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Waives New York state application fees for veterans who were honorably discharged or released under honorable circumstances from such service.
Title
Waives New York state application fees for veterans who were honorably discharged or released under honorable circumstances from such service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s946a |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.640 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | print number 1105b |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | print number 1105a |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S00946 (Same As) 2017-11-11 - APPROVAL MEMO.11