NY A01104 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an affirmative defense for causes of actions related to violation of a patent, trademark or other intellectual property right on grounds that a party possessed or used seeds or plants that contained genetically engineered or genetically modified organisms without entering into an agreement or paying fees to the manufacturer or licensed distributor of such products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an affirmative defense for causes of actions related to violation of a patent, trademark or other intellectual property right on grounds that a party possessed or used seeds or plants that contained genetically engineered or genetically modified organisms without entering into an agreement or paying fees to the manufacturer or licensed distributor of such products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2019-02-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-05Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.22
2019-01-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S04206 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback