NY A01100 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - print number 1100a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - print number 1100a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an operator of a motor vehicle to exercise due care to avoid colliding with a disabled vehicle or a motor vehicle involved in an accident which is parked, stopped, or standing on the shoulder of a highway.
Title
Requires an operator of a motor vehicle to exercise due care to avoid colliding with a disabled vehicle or a motor vehicle involved in an accident which is parked, stopped, or standing on the shoulder of a highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | print number 1100a |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S08258 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - referred to transportation