NY A01098 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - print number 1098a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - print number 1098a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the earnings limitation for retired police officers employed as school resource officers.
Title
Eliminates the earnings limitation for retired police officers employed as school resource officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | Assembly | print number 1098a |
2016-02-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03357 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - referred to governmental employees