NY A01087 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - REFERRED TO AGING
Pending: Senate Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the appropriate rent control agency or administrative agency or supervising agency to send a notice of required renewal to each head of household currently receiving an exemption under the SCRIE program 30 days prior to the application renewal date.
Title
Requires the appropriate rent control agency or administrative agency or supervising agency to send a notice of required renewal to each head of household currently receiving an exemption under the SCRIE program 30 days prior to the application renewal date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.47 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.56 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.56 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S00465 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO AGING