NY A01082 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s7535a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - substituted by s7535a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a banking institution must cash checks drawn on said institution, if payee presents forms of valid identification; makes such institution guilty of a violation for refusal to cash such check after proper identification.
Title
Provides that a banking institution must cash checks drawn on said institution, if payee presents forms of valid identification; makes such institution guilty of a violation for refusal to cash such check after proper identification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted by s7535a |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.287 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 1082a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S07535 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - SIGNED CHAP.830