NY A01078 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to conforming the definition of palliative care under hospice provisions to be the same as under other public health law provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to conforming the definition of palliative care under hospice provisions to be the same as under other public health law provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-08Senate3RD READING CAL.540
2019-05-08SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4582
2019-02-27SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2019-02-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-26Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.53
2019-02-11Assemblyreported
2019-02-04Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04582 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1078

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01078&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01078&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A01078
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01078&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01078&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A01078&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A1078#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback