NY A01075 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-25 - signed chap.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-25 - signed chap.2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical corrections relating to permitting the holder of a wholesalers license to sell certain food and seasonal specialty items and to install and operate automated teller machines.
Title
Makes technical corrections relating to permitting the holder of a wholesalers license to sell certain food and seasonal specialty items and to install and operate automated teller machines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-25 | Senate | signed chap.2 |
2013-01-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-01-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-01-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-01-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.3 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2133 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.10 |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.10 |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | reported |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S02133 (Same As) 2013-01-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1075