NY A01071 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - print number 1071b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to relation to judgments of parentage for children conceived through assisted reproduction or pursuant to surrogacy agreements; repeals provisions relating to the legitimacy of children born by artificial insemination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to relation to judgments of parentage for children conceived through assisted reproduction or pursuant to surrogacy agreements; repeals provisions relating to the legitimacy of children born by artificial insemination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15Assemblyprint number 1071b
2019-05-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2019-02-27Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-22Assemblyprint number 1071a
2019-02-22Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to judiciary
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S02071 (Same As) 2019-05-14 - PRINT NUMBER 2071A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback