NY A01054 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-06 - print number 1054b
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-06 - print number 1054b
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the creation and imposition of restrictive commercial practices and stringent recordkeeping and reporting to prevent gun sales to criminals; provides that such measures shall be promulgated by the superintendent of state police; restricts premises of sales; requires employee training; prohibits straw purchases; imposes additional license conditions.
Title
Requires the creation and imposition of restrictive commercial practices and stringent recordkeeping and reporting to prevent gun sales to criminals; provides that such measures shall be promulgated by the superintendent of state police; restricts premises of sales; requires employee training; prohibits straw purchases; imposes additional license conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-06 | Assembly | print number 1054b |
2020-11-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | print number 1054a |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to economic development |