NY A01031 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum educational requirements of certain town and village justices.
Title
Establishes minimum educational requirements of certain town and village justices.
Sponsors
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. William Magnarelli [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Michael Lawler [R] | Asm. Karen McMahon [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.175 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.175 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00437 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY