NY A00998 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-12 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health, in consultation with the commissioner of the office of general services, to conduct a study on the use of solid antimicrobial materials for touch surfaces in the construction of public buildings.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health, in consultation with the commissioner of the office of general services, to conduct a study on the use of solid antimicrobial materials for touch surfaces in the construction of public buildings.
Sponsors
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D] |
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.59 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.287 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.287 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 998a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reference changed to governmental operations |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S03905 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO LABOR