NY A00998 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-25 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes motor vehicles with purposefully obstructed license plates to be impounded at the discretion of law enforcement.
Title
Authorizes motor vehicles with purposefully obstructed license plates to be impounded at the discretion of law enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-20 | Assembly | print number 998a |
2016-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2015-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |