NY A00990 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - substituted by s1306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - substituted by s1306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Adirondack road salt reduction task force and pilot program.
Title
Establishes the Adirondack road salt reduction task force and pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Assembly | substituted by s1306 |
2021-02-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.84 |
2021-02-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01306 (Same As) 2021-02-16 - SIGNED CHAP.67