NY A00982 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - substituted by s1694a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - substituted by s1694a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that all school districts are approved evaluators of preschool students suspected of having a disability.
Title
Establishes that all school districts are approved evaluators of preschool students suspected of having a disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s1694a |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.82 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.82 |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | print number 982a |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2017-01-10 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01694 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - SIGNED CHAP.429