NY A00976 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - signed chap.31
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the establishment of the statewide electronic tracking system for evidence collection kits used to collect and preserve evidence of a sexual assault or other sex offense that are submitted to the custody of law enforcement; relates to the effectiveness of such provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the establishment of the statewide electronic tracking system for evidence collection kits used to collect and preserve evidence of a sexual assault or other sex offense that are submitted to the custody of law enforcement; relates to the effectiveness of such provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-03Assemblysigned chap.31
2023-03-03Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-02-07SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-02-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-02-07Senate3RD READING CAL.163
2023-02-07SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2226
2023-01-24SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-01-24Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-01-24Assemblypassed assembly
2023-01-24Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.45
2023-01-24Assemblyrules report cal.45
2023-01-24Assemblyreported
2023-01-24Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-01-11Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S02226 (Same As) 2023-02-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A976

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback