NY A00976 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the moratorium on the processing and approval of applications for licensure of licensed home care services agencies; permits the commissioner of health to grant exemptions from such moratorium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the moratorium on the processing and approval of applications for licensure of licensed home care services agencies; permits the commissioner of health to grant exemptions from such moratorium.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-02-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-28Senate3RD READING CAL.144
2019-02-28SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1820
2019-02-04SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2019-02-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.18
2019-01-29Assemblyreported
2019-01-14Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01820 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A976

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback