NY A00972 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - signed chap.27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - signed chap.27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to ensuring paid employees of a county airport or county aviation department which perform fire response or fire rescue duties are eligible for equal benefits as other paid firefighters.
Title
Relates to ensuring paid employees of a county airport or county aviation department which perform fire response or fire rescue duties are eligible for equal benefits as other paid firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-16 | Assembly | signed chap.27 |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-02-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-02-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.79 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1308 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.8 |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | reported |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S01308 (Same As) 2021-02-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A972